MO HB1911 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions of law relating to animal chiropractic practitioners
Title
Creates new provisions of law relating to animal chiropractic practitioners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |