MO HB1973 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - Referred: Rules(H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - Referred: Rules(H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reorganized the Joint Committee on Legislative Research into the Revision, Oversight, and Policy Impact divisions
Title
Reorganized the Joint Committee on Legislative Research into the Revision, Oversight, and Policy Impact divisions
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Flanigan [R] | Rep. Sue Allen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1973&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1973I.htm |