MO HB2071 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Transportation(H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Transportation(H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to personal property tax obligations and motor vehicle, trailer, and boat registration
Title
Modifies provisions relating to personal property tax obligations and motor vehicle, trailer, and boat registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-21 | House | Prefiled (H) |