MO HB2083 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation to issue emergency utility response permits for the transporting of equipment and material needed following a disaster where utility service has been disrupted
Title
Requires the Department of Transportation to issue emergency utility response permits for the transporting of equipment and material needed following a disaster where utility service has been disrupted
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-17 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-03 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-04-02 | Referred: Utilities (H) | |
2012-03-30 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2083&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB2083I.htm |