MO HB2171 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Third Read and Defeated (H) - AYES: 51 NOES: 80 PRESENT: 9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Third Read and Defeated (H) - AYES: 51 NOES: 80 PRESENT: 9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions governing workforce development in elementary and secondary education
Title
Modifies provisions governing workforce development in elementary and secondary education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - House: HB 2171 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House: HB 2171 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 80 NV: 9 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2022-04-11 - House - House: HB 2171 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 86 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House: HB 2171 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 80 NV: 9 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2022-04-11 - House - House: HB 2171 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 86 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | Third Read and Defeated (H) - AYES: 51 NOES: 80 PRESENT: 9 |
2022-04-14 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-04-11 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted. |
2022-04-11 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2022-04-11 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-04-11 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-02-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-07 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2022-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |