MO HB2172 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements for any entitity providing dental services
Title
Establishes requirements for any entitity providing dental services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred: Health Insurance(H) |
2014-03-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2172&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB2172I.htm |