MO HB2172 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Fourth Amendment Affirmation Act"
Title
Establishes the "Fourth Amendment Affirmation Act"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-03-05 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2018-01-18 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2172&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5771H.01I.pdf |