MO HB2172 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the expiration date of certain agricultural tax credits to December 31, 2028
Title
Extends the expiration date of certain agricultural tax credits to December 31, 2028
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-05-05 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-12 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 17 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |