MO HB2262 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Adjutant General to establish the Missouri Youth Challenge Academy for at-risk high school age youth
Title
Allows the Adjutant General to establish the Missouri Youth Challenge Academy for at-risk high school age youth
Sponsors
Rep. David Day [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-05-27 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-13 | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 138 NOES: 2 | |
2010-05-13 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 133 NOES: 3 | |
2010-05-13 | House Concurs (H) - SA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 144 NOES: 2 | |
2010-05-05 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SA 1 | |
2010-05-05 | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-05-05 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-05-05 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-04-28 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-28 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2010-04-27 | Executive Session Scheduled - VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-04-27 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-26 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 27, 2010, 1:30P.M.SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1 | |
2010-04-15 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2010-04-14 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-04-14 | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-04-14 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-04-08 | Perfected (H) | |
2010-04-08 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2010-04-06 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-06 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-06 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-18 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-18 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-04 | Referred: Veterans (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-03-01 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |