MO HB2288 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the definition of "earnable compensation" for the police retirement system of the City of St. Louis
Title
Modifies the definition of "earnable compensation" for the police retirement system of the City of St. Louis
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Hovis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2024-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |