MO HB2291 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the duration of time for which retired teachers and school employees may teach without losing their retirement benefits.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the duration of time for which retired teachers and school employees may teach without losing their retirement benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Black [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2291&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/5154H.02I.pdf |