MO HB2291 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a sales tax exemption for firearms and ammunition
Title
Authorizes a sales tax exemption for firearms and ammunition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-05-02 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-11 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2024-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |