MO HB2328 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Government Efficiency and Downsizing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Government Efficiency and Downsizing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the process by which public notice is required to be published
Title
Modifies the process by which public notice is required to be published
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H) |
2024-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |