MO HB2336 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes adoption of a property maintenance code and establishes nuisance actions in Boone County.
Title
Authorizes adoption of a property maintenance code and establishes nuisance actions in Boone County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-03-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |