MO HB2423 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Mark Twain Memorial Highway" in Marion County.
Title
Establishes the "Mark Twain Memorial Highway" in Marion County.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Riggs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2423&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/5039H.01I.pdf |