MO HB2596 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions for the deployment of electric vehicle charging stations.
Title
Creates provisions for the deployment of electric vehicle charging stations.
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Bondon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2596&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/6600H.01I.pdf |