MO HB2689 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes new state energy policies
Title
Establishes new state energy policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - House - House: HB 2689 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House: HB 2689 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House: HB 2689 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House: HB 2689 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House: HB 2689 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS withdrawn |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SSA 1 for SA 1, SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1 and SS pending |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment(S) |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-04-07 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-07 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-05 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2016-04-05 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-04-05 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-17 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Utilities(H) |
2016-03-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred: Energy and the Environment(H) |
2016-03-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |