MO HB2701 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to Missouri state highway patrol salary increases
Title
Modifies provisions relating to Missouri state highway patrol salary increases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-25 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Public Policy(H) |
2024-02-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |