MO HB2852 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires paint manufacturers to establish a paint recycling program and prohibits the sale of their paint in the absence of a recycling program
Title
Requires paint manufacturers to establish a paint recycling program and prohibits the sale of their paint in the absence of a recycling program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |