MO HB618 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the disposition of human remains
Title
Changes the laws regarding the disposition of human remains
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-15 - House - HB 618 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 144 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-15 - House - HB 618 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 146 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-15 - House - HB 618 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 109 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - HB 618 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - HB 618 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-05-15 - House - HB 618 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 146 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-15 - House - HB 618 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 109 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - HB 618 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - HB 618 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-07-10 | House | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-05-27 | House | House Message (H) |
2015-05-15 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-15 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 146 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-15 | House | Taken Up |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-05-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-30 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 1 |
2015-04-22 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-20 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-04-20 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-04-20 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 17 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2015-01-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-21 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |