MO HCR41 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Applies to Congress for the calling of a convention to propose certain amendments to the United States Constitution which place limits on the federal government
Title
Applies to Congress for the calling of a convention to propose certain amendments to the United States Constitution which place limits on the federal government
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Moon [R] | Sen. Eric Burlison [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-05-08 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-05-08 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-05-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-05-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-05-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-28 | House | Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin (H) - General Laws |
2014-04-28 | House | Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin (H) |
2014-04-28 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Offered (H) |