MO HCR49 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-13 - Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-13 - Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the week of May 18th - 24th "Missouri Safe Boating Week"
Title
Designates the week of May 18th - 24th "Missouri Safe Boating Week"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | Senate | Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2014-05-12 | House | Reported to The Senate (S) |
2014-05-08 | House | Adopted (H) |
2014-05-08 | House | Taken Up |
2014-04-29 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-29 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-29 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-28 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-04-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources(H) |
2014-04-14 | House | Offered (H) |