MO HJR126 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of Missouri relating to property tax
Title
Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of Missouri relating to property tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-04-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Public Policy(H) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |