MO HJR127 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment authorizing excursion gambling boats and floating facilities on the Osage River
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment authorizing excursion gambling boats and floating facilities on the Osage River
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |