MO HJR188 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to impose an appropriation spending limitation and to establish the "Tax Reform Fund" to be used to fund budgetary shortfalls, subject to an appropriation limitation, and allows for certain taxation changes based on revenue triggers, by general law
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment to impose an appropriation spending limitation and to establish the "Tax Reform Fund" to be used to fund budgetary shortfalls, subject to an appropriation limitation, and allows for certain taxation changes based on revenue triggers, by general law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tax Reform(H) |
2024-03-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |