MO HJR56 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-15 - Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
Pending: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-15 - Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
Pending: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment specifying that parents have a fundamental right to exercise exclusive control over the care, custody, education, and upbringing of their minor children
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment specifying that parents have a fundamental right to exercise exclusive control over the care, custody, education, and upbringing of their minor children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 15, 2014, 8:00am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Pensions(S) |
2014-03-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 112 NOES: 36 |
2014-03-13 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2014-03-11 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED |
2014-03-11 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-03-11 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2014-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |