MO HJR94 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions for voter identification
Title
Modifies provisions for voter identification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - House: HJR 94 HJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) |
2022-03-10 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 97 NOES: 36 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-10 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2022-03-08 | House | Perfected (H) |
2022-03-08 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-03-08 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2022-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-08 | House | Prefiled (H) |