MO SB1018 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes an earned income tax credit
Title
Authorizes an earned income tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 1018-Schmitt |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26535030 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB1018.pdf |