MO SB1050 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (3500S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (3500S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to digital mining
Title
Creates new provisions relating to digital mining
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (3500S.02C) |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |