MO SB1074 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits political subdivisions from using federal funds for the construction of retail broadband internet infrastructure in certain circumstances
Title
Prohibits political subdivisions from using federal funds for the construction of retail broadband internet infrastructure in certain circumstances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2022-01-19 | Senate | S First Read |