MO SB164 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts in bankruptcy proceedings life insurance proceeds for the burial of a family member, modifies insurance foreign investment limits, changes the requirements for the valuation of reserves for life insurance, and modifies provisions regarding qualified spousal trusts
Title
Exempts in bankruptcy proceedings life insurance proceeds for the burial of a family member, modifies insurance foreign investment limits, changes the requirements for the valuation of reserves for life insurance, and modifies provisions regarding qualified spousal trusts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | S concurs in HCS |
2015-05-04 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-04 | House | HCS H adopted |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-04-29 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-04-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) |
2015-04-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass H Property, Casualty and Life Insurance Committee w/HCA 1 |
2015-04-20 | House | Voted Do Pass H Property, Casualty and Life Insurance Committee w/Amendments |
2015-04-20 | House | Hearing Conducted H Property, Casualty and Life Insurance Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred H Property, Casualty and Life Insurance Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | H Second Read |
2015-03-17 | House | H First Read |
2015-03-17 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 164-Sifton |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled |