MO SB3 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-14 - No motion made to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-14 - No motion made to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes photo identification requirements for voting and requirements for advance voting
Title
Establishes photo identification requirements for voting and requirements for advance voting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-14 | No motion made to override Governor's veto | |
2011-06-17 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-05-10 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-10 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-10 | S concurs in HCS#2, as amended | |
2011-05-09 | Motion to concur in HCS#2, as amended S withdrawn | |
2011-05-04 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-04 | HCS#2, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-05-04 | HA 2 to HCS#2 offered & defeated (Conway)--(0283L07.03L) | |
2011-05-04 | HA 1 to HCS#2 offered & adopted (Diehl)--(0283L07.02L) | |
2011-04-28 | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-04-28 | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-04-26 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-04-13 | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-13 | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-12 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-12 | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Elections Committee | |
2011-04-12 | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Elections Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Bill returned to committee of origin | |
2011-03-16 | Voted to return bill to committee of origin | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-03-10 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Elections Committee | |
2011-03-09 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Elections Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Hearing Conducted H Elections Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Referred H Elections Committee | |
2011-02-21 | H Second Read | |
2011-02-17 | H First Read | |
2011-02-17 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-02-17 | Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2011-02-17 | Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Perfected, as amended | |
2011-02-15 | SA 7 S offered & defeated (Justus)--(0283S01.23S) | |
2011-02-15 | SA 6 S offered & adopted (Callahan)--(0283S01.05F) | |
2011-02-15 | SA 5 S offered & defeated (Justus)--(0283S01.04F) | |
2011-02-15 | SA 4 S offered & adopted (Wright-Jones)--(0283S01.01S) | |
2011-02-15 | SA 3 S offered & adopted (Keaveny)--(0283S01.03F) | |
2011-02-15 | SSA 1 for SA 2 S offered & adopted (Schaaf)--(0283S01.02F) | |
2011-02-15 | SA 2 S offered (Justus)--(0283S01.17S) | |
2011-02-15 | SA 1 S offered & defeated (Green)--(0283S01.01F) | |
2011-02-10 | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor | |
2011-01-31 | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-01-05 | S First Read--SB 3-Stouffer | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |