MO SB756 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to public utilities
Title
Modifies provisions relating to public utilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-05-03 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-05-02 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions |
2022-04-27 | House | Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions |
2022-04-25 | House | Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions |
2022-04-19 | House | Referred H Financial Institutions |
2022-04-19 | House | H Second Read |
2022-04-14 | House | H First Read |
2022-04-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Oversight and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Perfected |
2022-04-11 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | SA 7 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Cierpiot)--(3774S10.34S) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | SA 6 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Koenig)--(3774S10.01S) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | SA 5 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Burlison)--(3774S10.24S) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Cierpiot)--(3774S10.02S) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Brown)--(3774S10.06S) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Rowden)--(3774S10.29S) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (White)--(3774S10.35S) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (White)--(3774S.10F) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee w/SCS |
2022-03-02 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (3774S.08C) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |