MO SB756 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies a property tax credit for certain seniors
Title
Modifies a property tax credit for certain seniors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2024-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2024-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2024-05-17 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2024-05-17 | House | HCS H defeated |
2024-05-06 | House | Bill Placed on H Informal Calendar SBs for Third Reading |
2024-04-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Regulatory Oversight |
2024-04-15 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Regulatory Oversight |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred H Rules - Regulatory Oversight |
2024-04-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Property Tax Reform |
2024-04-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Property Tax Reform |
2024-04-03 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Property Tax Reform |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Property Tax Reform |
2024-03-11 | House | H Second Read |
2024-03-07 | House | H First Read |
2024-03-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Perfected |
2024-03-04 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2024-03-04 | Senate | SA 5 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Moon)--(3172S08.21S) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (May)--(3172S08.26S) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Arthur)--(3172S08.23S) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (May)--(3172S08.15S) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Beck)--(3172S08.13S) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Luetkemeyer)--(3172S.08F) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee w/SCS |
2024-02-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee (3172S.06C) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |