MO SB779 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (5479S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (5479S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Department of Corrections employees' overtime to accrue upon completion of time worked in excess of an employee's normal shift
Title
Allows Department of Corrections employees' overtime to accrue upon completion of time worked in excess of an employee's normal shift
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (5479S.02C) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | S First Read--SB 779-Munzlinger |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=28965046 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB779.pdf |