MO SB823 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Board of Probation and Parole to conduct hearings with offenders via videoconference
Title
Allows the Board of Probation and Parole to conduct hearings with offenders via videoconference
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-02-23 | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-02-22 | S First Read--SB 823-Munzlinger |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=2495610 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB823.pdf |