MO SB823 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to child protection
Title
Modifies provisions relating to child protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy |
2022-05-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-25 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy |
2022-04-21 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy |
2022-04-14 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Public Policy |
2022-04-11 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Public Policy |
2022-04-11 | House | H Second Read |
2022-04-07 | House | H First Read |
2022-04-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Oversight and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Perfected |
2022-03-29 | Senate | SS#2, as amended, S adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 S offered & adopted (Schupp)--(4084S03.03S) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | SS#2 S offered (White)--(4084S.03F) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | SS S withdrawn |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Point of order Withdrawn (White) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Point of order (White) - SA 2 goes beyond scope of underlying bill - Point of order taken under advisement |
2022-03-07 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered (Moon)--(4084S02.01S) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(4084S02.02S) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | SS S offered (White)--(4084S.02F) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |