MO SB824 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to nurses
Title
Modifies provisions relating to nurses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading |
2018-05-18 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-15 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-05-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing |
2018-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing |
2018-05-02 | House | Hearing Conducted H Professional Registration and Licensing |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred H Professional Registration and Licensing |
2018-04-24 | House | H Second Read |
2018-04-23 | House | H First Read |
2018-04-19 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-04-18 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee w/SCS |
2018-03-01 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (5555S.02C) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 824-Cunningham |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled |