MO SB858 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 858-Romine, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 858-Romine, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Suspends state agency activities relating to the Clean Power Plan until a certain stay is lifted, and requires the Department of Natural Resources to submit an extension for submitting a final plan to the EPA upon the Clean Power Plan being upheld in federal court
Title
Suspends state agency activities relating to the Clean Power Plan until a certain stay is lifted, and requires the Department of Natural Resources to submit an extension for submitting a final plan to the EPA upon the Clean Power Plan being upheld in federal court
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Romine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 858-Romine, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending) |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-12 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Romine)--(5634S.05F) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee w/SCS |
2016-03-01 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (5634S.03C) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 858-Romine |