MO SB894 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state employee health care plan to offer actuarially equivalent benefit products to Medicare eligible participants and enacts various provisions relating to the diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorders
Title
Requires state employee health care plan to offer actuarially equivalent benefit products to Medicare eligible participants and enacts various provisions relating to the diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading | |
2010-05-12 | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2010-05-12 | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2010-05-11 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2010-05-11 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2010-05-11 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2010-05-05 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2010-05-05 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Health Insurance Committee | |
2010-05-04 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Health Insurance Committee | |
2010-04-27 | Hearing Conducted H Special Standing Committee on Health Insurance Committee | |
2010-04-20 | Referred H Special Standing Committee on Health Insurance Committee | |
2010-04-07 | H Second Read | |
2010-04-06 | H First Read | |
2010-04-06 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2010-04-01 | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Perfected | |
2010-03-18 | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor | |
2010-03-16 | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2010-02-04 | S First Read--SB 894-Dempsey and Crowell |