MO SB895 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to landlord-tenant actions, including eviction proceeding moratoriums and filings for transfers of real property with outstanding collectible judgments
Title
Modifies provisions relating to landlord-tenant actions, including eviction proceeding moratoriums and filings for transfers of real property with outstanding collectible judgments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2024-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2024-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2024-05-17 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2024-05-06 | House | Bill Placed on H Informal Calendar SBs for Third Reading |
2024-04-16 | House | Laid over - Bill will hold its place on H Calendar SBs for Third Reading |
2024-04-16 | House | Taken up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2024-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2024-04-04 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Small Business |
2024-04-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Small Business |
2024-03-25 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Small Business |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Small Business |
2024-03-11 | House | H Second Read |
2024-03-07 | House | H First Read |
2024-03-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Perfected |
2024-03-05 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Trent)--(3907S.02F) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from S Emerging Issues Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Emerging Issues Committee |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Emerging Issues Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Emerging Issues Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |