MO SB917 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to coal ash
Title
Modifies provisions relating to coal ash
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House: SB 917 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House: SB 917 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-05-03 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-03 | House | S concurs in HCS |
2018-04-30 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-04-30 | House | HCS H adopted |
2018-04-30 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & defeated (McCreery)--(5851H04.08H) |
2018-04-30 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Higdon)--(5851H04.04H) |
2018-04-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-19 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Utilities |
2018-04-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Utilities |
2018-04-18 | House | Hearing Conducted H Utilities |
2018-04-11 | House | Hearing Cancelled H Utilities |
2018-04-04 | House | Referred H Utilities |
2018-04-02 | House | H Second Read |
2018-03-29 | House | H First Read |
2018-03-29 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-03-27 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee w/SCS |
2018-02-21 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (5851S.02C) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | S First Read--SB 917-Crawford |