MO SB938 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions regarding licensing of assistant physicians
Title
Modifies provisions regarding licensing of assistant physicians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-04-13 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered (White)--(3738S06.02S) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS S offered (White)--(3738S.06F) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-03-30 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (White)--(3738S.04F) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee w/SCS |
2022-03-07 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (3738S.03C) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |