MO SB940 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various provisions relating to bingo
Title
Modifies various provisions relating to bingo
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by Senate President | |
2010-05-25 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2010-05-12 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2010-05-12 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-05-12 | S concurs in HCS | |
2010-05-12 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2010-05-12 | HCS H adopted | |
2010-05-06 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2010-05-06 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2010-05-03 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2010-05-03 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Veterans Committee | |
2010-04-27 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Veterans Committee | |
2010-04-27 | Hearing Conducted H Veterans Committee | |
2010-04-20 | Referred H Veterans Committee | |
2010-04-20 | H Second Read | |
2010-04-15 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-04-12 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-04-12 | Perfected | |
2010-04-08 | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor | |
2010-04-07 | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-02-18 | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-02-15 | S First Read--SB 940-Pearce |