MO SB940 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 1050 & 940)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 1050 & 940)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a student athlete who is suspected of sustaining a concussion or brain injury be removed from competition and administered a side line test designed with a concussion protocol
Title
Requires a student athlete who is suspected of sustaining a concussion or brain injury be removed from competition and administered a side line test designed with a concussion protocol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 1050 & 940) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | S First Read--SB 940-Schmitt |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=25065107 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB940.pdf |