MO SB955 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various provisions of the Missouri Certified and Licensed Real Estate Appraisers and Appraisal Management Company Regulation Act
Title
Modifies various provisions of the Missouri Certified and Licensed Real Estate Appraisers and Appraisal Management Company Regulation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | S First Read--SB 955-Cunningham |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=31394938 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB955.pdf |