MO SB955 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (6050S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (6050S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to reductions in automobile insurance coverage
Title
Modifies provisions relating to reductions in automobile insurance coverage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (6050S.02C) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | S First Read--SB 955-Cunningham |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=72576468 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB955.pdf |