MO SB973 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various provisions relating to hospitals, physical therapists, and medication
Title
Modifies various provisions relating to hospitals, physical therapists, and medication
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 973 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 132 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 973 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: SB 973 (*HA 1 HA 9) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: SB 973 (*HA 9, A.A.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: SB 973 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 973 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: SB 973 (*HA 1 HA 9) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: SB 973 (*HA 9, A.A.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: SB 973 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-13 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-13 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2016-05-11 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed--(5740S.08S) |
2016-05-11 | House | CCR S offered & adopted--(5740S08.1SR) |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-09 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-09 | House | H distributes CCR |
2016-05-06 | House | S conferees appointed: Wasson, Cunningham, Sater, Schupp, Sifton |
2016-05-05 | House | H conferees appointed: Jones, Cornejo, Rone, LaFaver, Lavender |
2016-05-05 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2016-05-05 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2016-05-04 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-04 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 9 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 1 to HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Solon)--(5740H05.26H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered (Bondon)--(5740H05.10H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Swan)--(5740H05.10H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & defeated (Hill)--(5740H05.23H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Davis)--(5740H05.12H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones)--(5740H05.25H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered (LaFaver)--(5740H05.08H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hoskins)--(5740H05.15H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(5740H05.04H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & defeated (Solon)--(5740H05.03H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rowland)--(5740H05.02H) |
2016-04-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) |
2016-04-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Health Insurance |
2016-04-20 | House | Voted Do Pass H Health Insurance |
2016-04-20 | House | Hearing Conducted H Health Insurance |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred H Health Insurance |
2016-04-12 | House | H Second Read |
2016-04-11 | House | H First Read |
2016-04-11 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-04-06 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee w/SCS |
2016-02-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee (5740S.04C) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-01-25 | Senate | S First Read--SB 973-Wasson |