MO SB992 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SB 992-Dempsey, with HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SB 992-Dempsey, with HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the State Capitol Complex Subcommittee of the Board of Public Buildings
Title
Creates the State Capitol Complex Subcommittee of the Board of Public Buildings
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Dempsey [R] | Rep. John Diehl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SB 992-Dempsey, with HCS |
2014-05-14 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-14 | House | HCS H adopted |
2014-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-05-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Hearing Cancelled H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-17 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-17 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | S First Read--SB 992-Dempsey |