MS HB1059 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-104-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow State Agencies To Charge Each Other For Services If Mississippi Management And Reporting Systems (mmrs) Statewide Application Charges Or Utilities Are Involved; To Amend Section 27-104-205, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Department Of Finance And Administration From The Agencies That Are Required To Be Funded From Appropriations From The State General Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State agencies; allow to charge each other for MMRS charges and utilities.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Died In Conference |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Burton,Michel |
2018-03-19 | House | Conferees Named Read,DeLano,Bounds |
2018-03-07 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Amended |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2018-01-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-01-25 | House | Passed |
2018-01-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Appropriations |